SHELDON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 22 May 1998: Standard registration
- SHELDON CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW ATKINS | Chair | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Sizer | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Atkins | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN ATKINS | Trustee | 31 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY PEEL | Trustee | 31 January 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.81k | £81.91k | £77.53k | £80.01k | £85.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.98k | £55.43k | £61.40k | £72.35k | £74.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.39k | £11.76k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SHELDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
189 WHITECROFT ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B26 3RL
- Phone:
- 01217435533
- Email:
- info@sheldoncc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window