Financial history SYDENHAM NEIGHBOURHOOD INITIATIVES LIMITED

Charity number: 1077333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £186.10k £112.05k £159.63k £185.55k £282.23k
Total expenditure £163.39k £140.15k £169.36k £198.62k £269.01k
Income from government contracts £32.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.82k £43.50k £54.85k £75.49k