SYDENHAM NEIGHBOURHOOD INITIATIVES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Sydenham in Leamington Spa and the neighbourhood thereof without distinction of age, sex, sexual orientation, disability, race or of political or religious or other opinions. The SYDNI Centre is a multicultural community centre set in the heart of the Sydenham estate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £75,494 from 11 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
64 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 September 1999: Standard registration
- SYDNI (Working name)
- THE SYDENHAM PROJECT (Working name)
- SYDENHAM COMMUNITY PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID IAN RAWCLIFFE | Chair | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vereena Anne Jones | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ella Billiald | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Krishan Bhardwaj | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Will Roberts | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jerome Tucker | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edwards Zara | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Davies | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAY BUGG | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.10k | £112.05k | £159.63k | £185.55k | £282.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.39k | £140.15k | £169.36k | £198.62k | £269.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £32.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £32.82k | £43.50k | £54.85k | £75.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JUNE 1999, AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SYDENHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING, PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, ENSURE SPIRITUAL SUPPORT, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS ('THE OBJECTS') AND TO PARTICIPATE IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE COMMUNITY PROJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
SYDENHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (LEAMINGTON SPA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
SYDNI CENTRE
COTTAGE SQUARE
SYDENHAM
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV31 1PT
- Phone:
- 01926422071
- Email:
- mkbriggs87@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window