Financial history MUSIC AS THERAPY

Charity number: 1070760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £155.35k £144.16k £154.63k £181.46k £167.17k
Total expenditure £121.44k £153.85k £172.72k £186.00k £191.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A