SLSCO-FLAME, SRI LANKA SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ORGANISATION FRIENDS OF LANKA FOR AID, MENTORING AND EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity has been inactive for a long time now, we are a new group with the president trying to reactivate the charity and enhance our charitable activities further. We are looking forward to refresh this charity works in line with our works carried out at the moment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 27 July 1999: Standard registration
- F.A.M.E (Working name)
- FLAME SRI LANKA (Working name)
- FLAME UK (Working name)
- SLSCO-FLAME (Working name)
- SLSCO-FLAME, SRI LANKA SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ORGANISATION - FRIENDS OF LANKA FOR AID, MENTORING AND EDUCATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUNIL SENEVIRATNE - PRESIDENT | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.27k | £89.67k | £14.70k | £19.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.93k | £47.32k | £30.55k | £57.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1299 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1299 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 8 MARCH 1998, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 27 SEPTEMBER 1998, 19 JUNE 1999, ORDER OF 27 JUNE 2006 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 13 AUGUST 2006, 25 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 27 JAN 2008.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING ORPHANS, OTHER CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SRI LANKA AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE OF SRI LANKAN ORIGIN BY: (1) ADVANCING EDUCATION (2) RELIEVING PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED (3) PROVIDING OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO MAY USE THEM (4) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE MANY FACETS OF THE SRI LANKAN CULTURE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND SRI LANKA
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 SUSSEX AVENUE
ISLEWORTH
TW7 6LA
- Phone:
- 02085601488
- Email:
- SUGATHSENEVI@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window