Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE WHITEPOST HEALTH CARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1070821
Charity reporting is overdue by 1760 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 299 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 299 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 665 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 665 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1030 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1030 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1395 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1395 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1760 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1760 days