Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE WHITEPOST HEALTH CARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1070821
Charity reporting is overdue by 1760 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £40 £2 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £40 £0 £1.50k £1.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0