STEPPING STONES COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stepping Stones provides excellent quality, affordable pre-school care and education to children aged 2.5 to school age. We are community run and so provide a vital hub to our rural community. We offer parenting advice and support to families of the group and have close links with other local childrens' services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income includes £65,474 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Somerset
Governance
- 08 June 1998: Standard registration
- 09 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- STEPPING STONES COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (BRISTOL) (Previous name)
- STEPPING STONES COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL (BRISTOL) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.18k | £79.29k | £72.05k | £83.44k | £90.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.27k | £75.66k | £68.52k | £83.13k | £87.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £45.26k | £58.31k | £65.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 October 2014
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window