THE SCAYNES HILL VILLAGE CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of facilities in the form of a village centre for hire by individuals or organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 May 1998: Standard registration
- SCAYNES HILL MILLENNIUM VILLAGE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen MINTER FMCA | Chair | 21 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Helen Robertson | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Esther Rose Featherstone | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Pafford | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Santiago Carlos Gil | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Grindrod | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Packham | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mahon | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Maxted Brennan | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Hawes | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cook | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Crosta | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.20k | £33.37k | £38.47k | £36.10k | £37.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.75k | £38.52k | £35.83k | £29.59k | £43.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.75k | £3.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 21ST MAY 1998
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LINDFIELD RURAL IN THE COUNTY OF WEST SUSSEX WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LINDFIELD RURAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clearwater Ridge
Clearwater Lane
Lewes Road
Scaynes Hill
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 7NF
- Phone:
- 01444831511
- Email:
- BOOK@SCAYNESHILLCENTRE.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window