LIVERPOOL CAT WELFARE AND SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rehome and rescue domesticated and ferel cats and neutering. Offer help and advice to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 08 September 1998: Standard registration
- LIVERPOOL CAT PROTECTION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUNE WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA JANE COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.33k | £290.36k | £125.62k | £146.02k | £86.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.43k | £180.21k | £130.11k | £155.48k | £72.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.67k | £21.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 January 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 January 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF CATS, KITTENS AND FERAL CATS IN LIVERPOOL AND ELSEWHERE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS NEGLECT OR MALTREATMENT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A RESCUE AND RE-HOMING SERVICE AND A SANCTUARY FOR THE TEMPORARY OF PERMANENT ACCOMMODATION OF SUCH CATS. 2) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A NEUTERING SERVICE FOR CATS AND KITTENS WHOSE OWNERS ARE UNABLE TO PAY FOR SUCH SERVICES.
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Golf View
Wheathill Road
LIVERPOOL
L36 5US
- Phone:
- 07946859965
- Website:
-
liverpoolcatwelfare.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window