FRIENDS OF HARTING CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to raise funds for the preservation of the fabric of St Mary and St Gabriel Church, South Harting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL EDWARD HODGSON | Chair | 03 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Andrew Christie | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Clare Twiss | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hames Klima | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Temple | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Holmes | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Etta Ferrier | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wolsey Harris | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Wilcox | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
FIONA KEOGHANE | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.70k | £8.98k | £9.90k | £10.41k | £16.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £210 | £476 | £481 | £5.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 1998.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, IMPROVEMENT AND RECONSTRUCTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY AND ST. GABRIEL, HARTING , ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS, AND ITS CHURCHYARD. 2. IN THE EVENT OF THE CHURCH BEING MADE REDUNDANT OR OTHERWISE CEASING TO BE USED REGULARLY FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP, TO CONTINUE TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE AND RECONSTRUCT THE CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE.
Area of benefit
THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY AND ST. GABRIEL, HARTING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor House
North Lane
South Harting
PETERSFIELD
Hampshire
GU31 5NN
- Phone:
- 01730825427
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window