EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION FOR DANCE HISTORY

Charity number: 1072589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the education of the general public in the history of dance and the development of research in the history of dance. The promotion of exchanges between research workers in the history of dance in a European context. The organisation of conferences and other activities on research projects. The publication of an annual journal.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £4,210
Total expenditure: £1,525

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Austria
  • Belgium
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • France
  • Germany
  • Italy
  • Netherlands
  • Northern Ireland
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Spain
  • Sweden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • E A D H (Working name)
  • EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION OF DANCE HISTORIANS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sarah McCleave Trustee 11 January 2025
None on record
Geoff Whitlock Trustee 07 November 2015
None on record
Jenny Elizabeth Castello Trustee 07 November 2015
None on record
Dr Ricardo Barros Trustee 14 March 2013
None on record
Dr CAROL MARTIN Trustee 14 March 2013
None on record
Dr MADELEINE INGLEHEARN Trustee
MERCURIUS COMPANY
Received: On time
SHEILA DICKIE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £4.35k £8.84k £5.07k £4.54k £4.21k
Total expenditure £657 £6.50k £3.42k £2.79k £1.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 23 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 19 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 31 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Whites Hill Cottages
Whites Hill
Sulhamstead
READING
RG7 4EL
Phone:
07591991714