Accounts and annual returns CLARE HOUSE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1069643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 05 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 01 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window