OLD FORD HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1075125
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the Association is the provision of accommodation for people on low incomes in housing need. The Association is involved in the development and management of housing properties.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments and/or benefits from the charity for being a trustee

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Havering
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 1999: Standard registration
  • 28 April 2017: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £18.79m £23.34m £29.15m £27.14k £36.06m
Total expenditure £19.59m £24.69m £31.31m £28.61k £31.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £19.00k £0 £0 N/A £184.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £18.63m £22.75m £28.14m N/A £34.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £28.00k £486.00k £872.00k N/A £12.00k
Income - Other £106.00k £102.00k £135.00k N/A £1.86m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.23m £24.43m £30.89m N/A £21.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £61.00k £257.00k £420.00k N/A £9.90m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Own use assets £126.13m £143.12m £147.44m N/A £204.02m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Other assets £31.53m £25.35m £35.32m N/A £12.92m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£405.00k -£710.00k -£865.00k N/A -£1.12m
Total liabilities £138.53m £150.72m £167.16m N/A £196.54m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 28 January 2015 On Time