CENTRE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects are to advance education and further knowledge of science and technology for the benefit of the public in the UK and worldwide. The charity's principle activity, as stated in the Memorandum of Association and internal Terms of Reference, is promoting science in schools and the community by the provision of lectures, workshops, interactive dramas and the Top Class competition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 September 1998: Standard registration
- CAST EDUCATION (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen Ashworth | Chair | 09 December 2019 |
|
|||||
John Perrem | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bethany Nichols | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony William Blake | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.92k | £10.50k | £105 | £17.56k | £9.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.84k | £6.03k | £12.03k | £6.41k | £7.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION CONVERSION 17 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO FURTHER KNOWLEDGE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE. THIS MAY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, INCLUDE THE UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORT OF RESEARCH INTO SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND EDUCATION AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 BLAKENEY CLOSE
NORWICH
NR4 7QP
- Phone:
- 07709968590
- Email:
- mailthepiercy@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window