WESSEX UROLOGY SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Patient support. Regular general and social meetings and activities. Some of these are attended by medical companies that manufacture and supply the appliances used by our members. Guest speakers and regular newsletter. Providing patient representation to a number of NHS groups and activities in the Dorset and Central South Coast Cancer Networks and on Peer Review teams in the South of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 February 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- West Sussex
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 August 1998: Standard registration
- 08 August 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 08 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1089464 CANCER RESEARCH UK
- WUSG (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 01/02/2023 | 01/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £1.96k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.62k | £328 | £75 | £3.15k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 2003, 11 OCTOBER 2003 AND 5 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE, ASSIST AND HELP ANY PERSON SUFFERING FROM ANY CONDITION THAT DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY AFFECTS THE BLADDER AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE UNDERGONE, OR ARE ABOUT TO UNDERGO UROLOGICAL SURGERY FOR URINARY DIVERSION IN THE AREA OF WILTSHIRE, DORSET, HAMPSHIRE, ISLE OF WIGHT & WEST SUSSEX AND TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE AND THAT OF THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM.
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE, DORSET, HAMPSHIRE, ISLE OF WIGHT & WEST SUSSEX.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window