SHOC, SLOUGH HOMELESS - OUR CONCERN

Charity number: 1070689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main activities of SHOC are to provide: Housing Advice and Tenancy Sustainment; Benefits, Grants and Money Management Support, Health Management Programme, Education and Employment Programme and Home Comforts such as hot meals, bathing and laundry facilities, clothing and toiletries. These services are all provided from our daycentre which is a safe and secure environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £232,762
Total expenditure: £237,926

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Slough

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • (SLOUGH HOMELESS-OUR CONCERN) (Working name)
  • SHOC (Working name)
  • SLOUGH HOMELESS- OUR CONCERN (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard David Kay Chair 07 November 2022
TRINITY HOMELESS PROJECTS
Received: On time
TRINITY ACTIVITIES
Received: On time
Jennifer Shepherd Trustee 11 November 2024
TRINITY HOMELESS PROJECTS
Received: On time
TRINITY ACTIVITIES
Received: On time
Damion Jones Trustee 11 November 2024
TRINITY HOMELESS PROJECTS
Received: On time
TRINITY ACTIVITIES
Received: On time
Rebecca Elizabeth Odedra Trustee 22 May 2022
TRINITY HOMELESS PROJECTS
Received: On time
TRINITY ACTIVITIES
Received: On time
Dr JAMES ANDREW CANNON Trustee 01 April 2014
TRINITY ACTIVITIES
Received: On time
TRINITY HOMELESS PROJECTS
Received: On time
THE TRACY TRUST
Received: On time
RAYMOND BRIAN WAITE Trustee
None on record
William Alan Madge Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £130.05k £234.63k £161.98k £239.07k £232.76k
Total expenditure £242.12k £216.17k £223.30k £239.24k £237.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
74 Ragstone Road
SLOUGH
SL1 2PX
Phone:
01753577747
Website:

sloughhomeless.org.uk