THE SLAVANKA TRUST

Charity number: 1072342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian Residential and Christian Education in the UK and world wide

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £151,280
Total expenditure: £257,901

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BOURNEMOUTH CONFERENCE CENTRE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JOHN HAROLD SIMMONS Chair
THE MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE FOURWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
THE BOURNEMOUTH CHEST DISEASES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GREAT WOOD TRUST
Received: On time
CANFORD SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev Rupert Shelley Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
David Cook Trustee 14 December 2022
None on record
RACHEL FRANCES DOWDY Trustee 18 September 2012
None on record
PAUL VERE LINDON Trustee 18 September 2012
WOBURN 1986
Received: On time
THE LITTLEGATE TRUST
Received: On time
WYCLIFFE HALL
Received: On time
LANIER THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NICOLA COOMBS Trustee
None on record
RICHARD WILLIAM HENRY BARKER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £122.94k £112.98k £113.91k £126.77k £151.28k
Total expenditure £225.56k £169.11k £184.95k £162.83k £257.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
103 Argentia Place
Portishead
BRISTOL
BS20 7QS
Phone:
07977913559