FRIENDS OF RAVENSCLIFFE HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1071795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide finanacial assistance in support of students needs outside that provided by school capitation provision.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £18,620
Total expenditure: £9,107

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel English Chair 28 February 2024
None on record
Rachel Joyce Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
Sarah Campbell Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Angela Harris Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Amanda Aspin Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Judy Jackson Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Jennifer Finder Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Andrea Kennedy Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
JO HAGUE Trustee
None on record
ANGELA RHODES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £40.94k £21.97k £7.30k £9.60k £18.62k
Total expenditure £324 £1.54k £48.56k £7.36k £9.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RAVENSCLIFFE HIGH SCHOOL
SKIRCOAT GREEN
HX3 0RZ
Phone:
01422358621
Website:

No information available