THE GLASS PARK MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Millennium Green provides facilities for informal recreation for all sectors of the local community, community events particularly involving children from the local primary schools. A large area of indigenous woodland has recently been planted under the auspices of the South Yorkshire Forest Project. Community planting of "Gift that Grows" trees donated under the carbon off-setting scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Doncaster
Governance
- 30 June 1998: Standard registration
- GLASS PARK MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST (Working name)
- THE GLASS PARK MILLENNIUM TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Robinson | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Cutts | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £2.07k | £588 | £726 | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £1.66k | £962 | £936 | £933 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS A MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Burns Road
Barnby Dun
Doncaster
Doncaster
Sth Yorkshire
DN3 1NY
- Phone:
- 07720 404479
- Email:
- john.berriman@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window