Trustees LEEK WESTWOOD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1071076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Charlotte Booth Chair 30 June 2021
None on record
Juliette Lloyd Trustee 18 October 2024
None on record
Kathryn Steele Trustee 14 June 2024
None on record
Lisa Reader Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Katie Elizabeth O'Brien Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Larna Roberts Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Rachel Wright Trustee 24 August 2015
None on record