CHELMSFORD WOMEN'S AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting women and children experiencing domestic violence through the provision of refuge accommodation and outreach services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
Total income includes £73,055 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 06 July 1998: Standard registration
- 27 April 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £457.27k | £438.24k | £285.96k | £175.00k | £92.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £418.38k | £366.48k | £555.86k | £176.70k | £93.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £73.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 04 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | 29 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 03 February 2016 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 06 July 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 03 June 2015 | 488 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 02 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN MALTREATED BY THEIR HUSBANDS OR BY MEN OR WOMEN WITH WHOM THEY ARE OR HAVE BEEN LIVING, AND AMONG THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN.
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window