HARROW WOMENS' CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides support and services to women resident in Harrow and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
Governance
- 08 December 1998: Standard registration
- Resourceful Women's Network: helping women to support themselves & their families (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marilyn D Devine | Chair | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bindu Jolly | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Whitehead | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Whitehead | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ranita Tanna | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr AGATHA FERRAO | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.94k | £1.42k | £2.75k | £25.14k | £11.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.41k | £9.00k | £12.82k | £20.84k | £24.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.36k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE WOMEN RESIDENT IN HARROW AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF HELP, SUPPORT AND ADVICE ON A RANGE OF ISSUES INCLUDING LEGAL RIGHTS, EMPLOYMENT, CHILD CARE, WELFARE RIGHTS, FINANCIAL MATTERS, DISCRIMINATION AGAINST WOMEN GENERALLY AND EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN MEN AND WOMEN GENERALLY. (11) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF WOMEN RESIDENTS AS AFORESAID BY MEANS OF TRAINING, COUNSELLING AND DISCUSSION GROUPS. (111) THE PROVISION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR WOMEN AND GIRLS RESIDENT AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
HARROW AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 NORTHOLT ROAD
HARROW
MIDDLESEX
HA2 0LH
- Phone:
- 07414932902
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window