Trustees RAYNES PARK HIGH SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1070374

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Rowett | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Louise Benzecry | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Tulloch | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Benjamin | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JORDAN | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTEN Taylor | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDY MOHUN-SMITH | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR IAN NEWMAN | Trustee | 26 February 1998 |
|
|||||
ALAN OAKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB HIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.