Financial history FRIENDS OF THE MOSCOW SCHOOL OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC SCIENCES

Charity Number: 1071356
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2011 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £720.31k £861.01k £575.51k £237.27k £66.75k
Total expenditure £717.89k £837.20k £513.19k £290.97k £97.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £133 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £720.18k £860.88k £575.19k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £320 N/A N/A
Income - Other £132 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £714.71k £834.62k £511.65k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.19k £2.58k £1.54k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £714.71k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A