Financial history WILBERFOSS COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1070842
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.05k £21.91k £23.84k £37.18k £37.18k
Total expenditure £26.47k £8.23k £15.68k £42.48k £42.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.63k £10.67k £5.00k £5.00k