Financial history ART ASIA TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1070019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £160.75k £203.93k £152.84k £165.90k £250.65k
Total expenditure £154.55k £69.28k £152.08k £231.83k £220.04k
Income from government contracts N/A £34.93k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £129.56k £168.92k £131.32k £137.19k £229.63k