CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF JESUS THE SAVIOUR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cameroon
- Germany
- Ghana
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
Governance
- 21 June 2000: Standard registration
- 09 February 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 11TH JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION OF ROMAN CATHOLIC WOMEN KNOWN AS THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF JESUS CHRIST THE SAVIOUR AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME WITH THE CONSENT OF THE SUPERIOR THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT IF AT ANY TIME THE COMMUNITY SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR TO CARRY ON PROMOTE OR SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE WORKS THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEREOF SHALL BE HELD FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window