THE FRIENDS OF ST. JOSEPH'S SCHOOL CHALFONT ST. PETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School Parent Teacher Organisation which raises money by fundraising events such as raffles, sales and evening events and also receives gift aided parent contributions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 05 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Louise Christian | Chair | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Morris | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Claire Houston | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Ewa Pilsniak | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Crone | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Lovegrove | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Liberty Minoli | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Carroll | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Skrabski | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.09k | £22.83k | £22.05k | £84.12k | £62.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.20k | £58.77k | £26.19k | £68.43k | £77.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) OF CHILDREN ATTENDING ST. JOSEPH'S ROMAN CATHOLIC COMBINED SCHOOL, PRIORY ROAD, CHALFONT ST. PETER, GERRARDS CROSS, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE SL9 8SB ('THE SCHOOL').
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Joseph's Catholic Primary School
PRIORY ROAD
CHALFONT ST. PETER
GERRARDS CROSS
SL9 8SB
- Phone:
- 01753 887743
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window