Financial history LODGE HILL TRUST

Charity number: 1071041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.17m £509.03k £641.67k £712.29k £1.41m
Total expenditure £752.15k £600.09k £628.48k £754.58k £801.71k
Income from government contracts £25.00k £60.29k £69.59k £59.96k £61.70k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £52.71k £4.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £580.60k £258.16k £219.27k £43.98k £20.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £27.81k
Income - Charitable activities £555.79k £218.81k £395.63k £639.80k £583.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.27k £1.69k £1.39k £2.83k £8.18k
Income - Other £29.28k £30.38k £25.37k £25.68k £767.49k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £752.15k £600.09k £628.48k £754.58k £801.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.29k £8.10k £7.62k £6.34k £14.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0