Trustees LODGE HILL TRUST

Charity number: 1071041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annamarie Tapponnier Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Louise Mary Gisbey Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
David John Adams Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Raymond Eric Dawe Trustee 24 October 2023
None on record
Jack Marriott Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Penelope Gay Barnes Trustee 23 October 2018
None on record
MATTHEW BARRY WYKES Trustee 18 October 2016
THE DAVID TILLEY CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ADRIAN GUY NELSON Trustee 24 August 2012
None on record
RICHARD WHITTAKER Trustee 24 August 2012
None on record