CRY IN THE DARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary beneficiaries are 22 young adults with special needs at Casa Lumina Romania. For whom this is their home. It is a model in the region for the care of those with special needs. Children's Hospice Lumina for children with terminal or life limiting illness and base for community palliative care services in the Bacau region Romania. Working in Ukraine helping those displaced by the war
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Romania
- Ukraine
Governance
- 14 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Andrew | Chair | 13 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lasky | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Harrison | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Chanarin | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE LINDA CORNWALL NNEB | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.43k | £214.91k | £235.79k | £183.00k | £192.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £286.05k | £168.17k | £213.16k | £242.00k | £181.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND ADULTS WORLD-WIDE, PARTICULARLY IN ROMANIA AND EASTERN EUROPE, BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACULTIES AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE, PARTICULARLY IN ROMANIA AND EASTERN EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Winterbourne Gardens
Elmstead
COLCHESTER
CO7 7FG
- Phone:
- 07957151805
- Email:
- steve@cryinthedark.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window