THE KINGS ROYAL HUSSARS MUSEUM IN WINCHESTER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects of the Charity: To educate the public and members of The Regiment in the history and military accomplishments of the former Regiments. To promote military efficiency and encourage recruitment by public exhibition of the Collections in a Museum or as the Trustees may from time to time decide. To conserve, restore, repair, re-construct and preserve articles in the Collections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 December 1998: Standard registration
- 31 January 2022: Funds received from 272107 THE MUSEUM OF THE KING'S ROYAL HUSSARS IN LANCASHI...
- 21 March 2022: Funds received from 272107 THE MUSEUM OF THE KING'S ROYAL HUSSARS IN LANCASHI...
- 22 March 2022: Funds transferred to 1190086 THE KING'S ROYAL HUSSARS MUSEUM CIO
- 22 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- HORSEPOWER (Working name)
- CABOT LEARNING FEDERATION (Previous name)
- THE KINGS ROYAL HUSSARS MUSEUM IN WINCHESTER TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.83k | £28.28k | £42.39k | £38.09k | £36.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.75k | £24.24k | £40.49k | £38.69k | £32.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 26 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 26 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 NOVEMBER 1998, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 16 OCTOBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE FORMER REGIMENTS AND TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT BY PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTIONS IN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS OR SUCH OTHER PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, AND TO CONSERVE, RESTORE, REPAIR, RE-CONSTRUCT AND PRESERVE ARTICLES IN THE COLLECTIONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window