Financial history CLWB PLANT LLANDEGFAN KID'S CLUB

Charity number: 1070044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 17/03/2023 17/03/2024
Total gross income £33.83k £40.70k £51.15k £51.15k £55.56k
Total expenditure £31.00k £45.47k £46.45k £46.45k £45.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £4.00k N/A £5.00k