Trustees HEBDEN BRIDGE ARTS FESTIVAL LTD
Charity Number: 1070600
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Hoy | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Shepherd | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Palfreeman | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Ghassempour | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chas Nicholson | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Roe | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Stuart | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joelle McNichol | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William alderson Snape | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jones | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.