ABU HURAIRAH ISLAMIC INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide for Islamic educational needs and to promote the Islamic faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 04 July 1998: Standard registration
- ABU HURAIRAH ACADEMY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYED RAZWAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ABU BAQR SADDIQ KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANGEAR BOSTAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED FAROOQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TAJ MOHAMMED KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AYUB LAHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED OSMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £344.51k | £296.63k | £318.67k | £274.98k | £295.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.96k | £216.50k | £222.15k | £249.73k | £256.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £102.65k | £105.16k | £12.91k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT AND PROPAGATION OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO MUSLIMS AND NON MUSLIMS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 CARRINGTON STREET
BRADFORD
WEST YORKSHIRE
BD3 8AE
- Phone:
- 01274 668448
- Email:
- info@abuhurairah.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window