Financial history POPETH CYMRAEG CYFYNGEDIG

Charity number: 1074898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £360.24k £327.39k £332.60k £334.52k £355.45k
Total expenditure £394.67k £345.45k £346.23k £349.46k £349.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.36k N/A N/A N/A £158