BERKSWELL SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To organise and take part in fund raising events throughout the academic year, to raise money for the School to advance the education of the pupils attending it. These events include Christmas and Summer Fayres, Raffles, Quiz Nights, and Discos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Solihull
Governance
- 25 June 2001: Standard registration
- BERKSWELL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE BERKSWELL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Crisp | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jo Haddon | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Power | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.58k | £9.18k | £3.84k | £3.86k | £6.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.19k | £2.92k | £5.39k | £1.84k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 August 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 July 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2022 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 July 2022 | 736 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. (B) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berkswell School
Church Lane
Berkswell
CV7 7BU
- Phone:
- 07931841461
- Email:
- ptaberkswellschool@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window