COUNTY DURHAM AUTISTIC SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE: ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES AND PROFESSIONALS, AN INFORMAL ADVICE LINE, TRAINING. WE WORK WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES PROMOTING AWARENESS AND IMPROVING SERVICES FOR PEOPLE ON THE AUTISTIC SPECTRUM. SUPPORT GROUP MEETINGS ARE HELD MONTHLY AT DARLINGTON AND STANLEY. GROUP ACTIVITIES FOR AUTISTIC CHILDREN, SIBLINGS AND THEIR FAMILIES ARE ORGANISED THROUGHOUT THE YEAR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
Governance
- 29 September 1998: Standard registration
- 31 August 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CDASG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.59k | £12.26k | £6.14k | £7.28k | £860 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.87k | £11.40k | £8.19k | £9.86k | £4.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 20 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 20 August 2012 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 24 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 August 2012 | 567 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 24 April 2011 | 83 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 20 August 2012 | 932 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 24 April 2011 | 448 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM (OR RELATED CONDITIONS) AND TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR THE FAMILIES AND CARES OF SUCH PERSONS; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS CONCERNING AUTISM AS THE COMMITTEE MAY DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window