THE ARTHUR RANK CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Arthur Rank Centre is an ecumenical national charity, which resources, trains, and advocates for rural Christians, rural churches and the communities they serve. Our vision is of confident rural Christians, encouraged to engage in effective mission and ministry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 June 2004: Standard registration
- ARC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor David Anthony Child Pink | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nicholas John Read | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Stuart John Burgess | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|||||||
Bishop Richard Jackson | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Judith James | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
BRIDGET DOWN | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Philip Wagstaff | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Benjamin Aldous | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Richard Teal | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.49k | £159.45k | £92.20k | £62.55k | £45.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.56k | £304.24k | £351.11k | £250.49k | £193.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/01/2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY PROMOTING RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES AND VALUES AMONGST RURAL COMMUNITIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION: 1. TO PROVIDE A FOCUS AND RESOURCE FOR THE WORK OF THE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES IN RURAL AREAS THROUGH THE SHARING OF GOOD PRACTICE, THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN MINISTRY; 2. TO LEAD THE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES IN WORKING TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THOSE LIVING OR WORKING IN RURAL COMMUNITIES; 3. DEVELOPING GREATER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN URBAN AND RURAL COMMUNITIES, THROUGH THE LINKING OF CHURCHES AND OTHER FAITH GROUPS.
Area of benefit
FOR THOSE LIVING AND WORKING IN RURAL COMMUNITIES. IN PRACTICE, NATIONALLY IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Arthur Rank Centre
The View
9 Barford Exchange
Wellesbourne Road
Barford
- Phone:
- 02476853060
- Email:
- info@arthurrankcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window