ALTRINCHAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain and support Altrincham Grammar School for Boys and any successor establishment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Trafford
Governance
- 07 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR R J RUSSELL-FISHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Timothy David Millward Shennan | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Wright | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Sadler | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JONATHAN GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.58k | £173.96k | £167.66k | £152.27k | £59.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.09k | £63.52k | £67.75k | £58.38k | £169.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND SUPPORT ALTRINCHAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS ("THE SCHOOL") AND ANY SUCCESSOR ESTABLISHMENT THE OBJECTS OF WHICH WILL BE TO ADVANCE LEARNING AND KNOWLEDGE BY TEACHING, PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE ACADEMIC ACHIEVEMENT OF ITS PUPILS, PROVIDING AND SUPPORTING A RANGE OF EXTRA-CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES AND PREPARING ITS PUPILS AND STUDENTS FOR A FULFILLING AND ACTIVE LIFE WITHIN BUILDINGS AND GROUNDS FIT FOR SUCH PURPOSES TO MAINTAIN AND SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF SELECTIVE GRAMMAR SCHOOL EDUCATION FOR BOYS AGED BETWEEN ELEVEN AND EIGHTEEN IN THE TOWN OF ALTRINCHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS
Area of benefit
ALTRINCHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Altrincham Grammar School for Boys
Marlborough Road
Bowdon
ALTRINCHAM
WA14 2RS
- Phone:
- 0161 928 0858
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window