AGE UK MID DEVON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a range of services for older people in Mid Devon, which include day services based in Tiverton, as well as Information and Advice, volunteer visiting and footcare services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £71,262 from 2 government contract(s) and £71,262 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 30 July 1998: Standard registration
- 03 August 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- AGE CONCERN TIVERTON & DISTRICT (Previous name)
- AGE CONCERN TIVERTON, CULLOMPTON & DISTRICT (Previous name)
- AGE UK TIVERTON, CULLOMPTON & DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.40k | £282.86k | £258.08k | £250.02k | £291.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.07k | £292.23k | £334.74k | £285.50k | £260.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £45.64k | £38.06k | £22.68k | £17.76k | £71.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.96k | £60.53k | £60.53k | £60.53k | £71.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 25 July 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/08/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/10/2013 as amended on 22 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") IS ESTABLISHED AND TO WHICH IT IS SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE IN AND AROUND THE AREA SERVED BY MID DEVON DISTRICT COUNCIL ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"): 4.1 ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; 4.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE THE OUTCOME OF THIS BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE
Area of benefit
MID DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window