THE BANBURY STEAM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to advance the education of the public by increasing and maintaining interest in all types of steam engines, tractors, agricultural machinery and equipment, veteran and vintage cars and any machinery of historical interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 01 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN ARTHUR WELLS | Chair | 20 May 1997 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Allan Mr | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Jay | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Reginald Jay | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.43k | £738 | £0 | £123.96k | £120.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.74k | £5.94k | £3.84k | £74.89k | £99.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2022
(These accounts |
04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING AND MAINTAINING INTEREST IN ALL TYPES OF STEAM ENGINES, INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES, TRACTORS, AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT, FAIR GROUND ORGANS AND EQUIPMENT VETERAN AND VINTAGE CARS AND ANY MACHINERY OF HISTORIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
129 MAIN ROAD
MIDDLETON CHENEY
BANBURY
OX17 2PW
- Phone:
- 01295710076
- Email:
- BLOXHAMSTEAM@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window