ST MARY'S SCHOOL CHARITY SLOUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN SLOUGH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Slough
Governance
- 05 February 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bally Gill | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Lynda Aldridge | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Eleanor Cryer MBE | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
Preston Brooker | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
RUSSELL FORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.26k | £9.34k | £8.62k | £8.56k | £8.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.61k | £6.41k | £7.86k | £9.22k | £11.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 24TH MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN LIVING IN SLOUGH BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS AT MAINTAINED AND GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOLS IN SLOUGH
Area of benefit
SLOUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAIRD HOUSE
ROWLEY LANE
WEXHAM
SLOUGH
SL3 6PB
- Phone:
- 01753662618
- Email:
- russell.ford@owenwhite.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window