LONDON, ILFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranging meetings for public worship, which includes Bible education and training in Christian living. Preaching the Christian message to the public within the congregation area. Distributing Bibles and other religious literature; also giving pastoral assistance to the congregation and the wider community. All of these services and facilities are provided without charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 June 1998: Standard registration
- 31 December 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 31 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1065881 LONDON, CHADWELL HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
- 31 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1066690 LONDON, LEYTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
- 31 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1065636 LONDON UPTON PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
- 31 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1065778 LONDON, DAGENHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
- 31 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1065825 LONDON, BARKINGSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
- 31 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1103197 London, Rippleside Congregation of Jehovah’s Witne...
- 31 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1065976 LONDON MANOR PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH’S WITNES...
- 31 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1067656 LONDON, NEWBURY PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.74k | £7.54k | £9.46k | £5.25k | £6.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £587.62k | £6.95k | £6.25k | £25.70k | £5.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 23 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 21 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 16 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 20 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH MAY 1997
Charitable objects
THE PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOUNDED ON THE HOLY BIBLE, INCLUDING THE PREACHING OF THE GOOD NEWS OF GOD'S KINGDOM BY JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE CONGREGATION AREA AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS FOR PUBLIC CHRISTIAN WORSHIP..
Area of benefit
LONDON ILFORD, MANOR PARK, REDBRIDGE, WANSTEAD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window