SWALLOW PLAYGROUP CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides childcare facilities for pre-school children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
Total income includes £78,091 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 25 June 1998: Standard registration
- 17 October 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1200451 SWALLOW PLAYGROUP CHARITY
- Swallow Playgroup Charitable Association (Working name)
- R.A.F ST. ATHANS COMMUNITY GROUPS (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL AIR FORCE ST. ATHAN COMMUNITY GROUPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.93k | £91.97k | £114.53k | £110.86k | £122.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.53k | £91.05k | £110.87k | £102.10k | £120.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | £71.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £52.92k | £42.55k | N/A | £88.44k | £78.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 13 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MAY 1998 as amended on 03 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY: (A) ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN. (B) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY/CHILDCARE IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. (C) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window