Accounts and annual returns THE LIGHTHOUSE (LYTCHETT MATRAVERS) TRUST

Charity number: 1071370
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 15 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 15 October 2015 On Time