ECO LEARNING LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADULT EDUCATION AFTER SCHOOL SERVICES DEAF WORK COMMUNICATOR/TRANSLATING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Lewisham
Governance
- 13 November 1998: Standard registration
- NDTP (Working name)
- NDTP NORTH DOWNHAM TRAINING PROJECT (Working name)
- NORTH DOWNHAM TRAINING PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Taylor | Chair | 04 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Oladele Adesanya Komolafe | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Haynes | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.94k | £43.04k | £84.96k | £19.15k | £12.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.47k | £31.05k | £18.84k | £62.16k | £14.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.26k | £74.62k | £19.15k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/04/2013 as amended on 05 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The Objects for which the Company is established are: 3.1 To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society, primarily but not exclusively through the provision of 3.1.1 training, information and guidance to enable individuals to improve their skill set and find better employment opportunities; 3.1.2 education about the use of technology and access to such technology; 3.1.3 resources and support to community groups who tackle social exclusion; 3.1.4 access for the public to properly managed libraries; 3.1.5 advocacy and consultancy; For the purpose of this clause “socially excluded” means being excluded from society or parts of society as a result of one or more of the following factors: unemployment, financial hardship, youth or old age, ill health (physical or mental), substance abuse or dependency including alcohol and drugs, discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, disability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, creed, sexual orientation or gender reassignment, poor educational or skills attainment, relationship or family breakdown, poor housing (that is housing that does not meet basic habitable standards), crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society). 3.2 The relief of unemployment for the benefit of the public in such ways as may be thought fit, including assistance to find employment. 3.3 The promotion and improvement of the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and the voluntary sector through the provision of capacity and capability building activities, advice, resources and general support.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Slade Green & Howbury Community Centre & Library
Chrome Road
ERITH
Kent
DA8 2EL
- Phone:
- 02032874866
- Email:
- finance@ecocom.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window