Financial history CAMDEN CANALS AND NARROWBOAT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1071702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.67k £621 £168 £6.21k £6.91k
Total expenditure £21.31k £8.14k £5.06k £7.50k £8.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A