KINGSLAND MILLENNIUM GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS KINGSLAND MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR THE INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 17 June 1998: Standard registration
- KMGT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JOHN HARRIS | Chair | 12 May 2018 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANN POTHECARY | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|||||
PAUL GRENVILLE SAUNDERS | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
PHILIP CHRISTOPHER | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jean Gurney | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev JULIE MARGARET READ | Trustee | 31 May 2014 |
|
|||||
HELEN JEAN FLOOK | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|||||
KATHARINE ELIZABETH SOPHIA CAVE-BROWNE-CAVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.47k | £4.05k | £5.58k | £5.60k | £17.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.79k | £3.11k | £5.10k | £7.26k | £6.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MAY 1998.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS KINGSLAND MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR THE INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
KINGSLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Coach House
West Town Court
Kingsland
Leominster
HR6 9SS
- Phone:
- 01568708592
- Email:
- kmgtsecretary@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window